GA HR1162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on the Establishment of a State Accreditation Process; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on the Establishment of a State Accreditation Process; create
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #686 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52869 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/173580 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52869#15978 |