GA HR1137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress and the President of the United States to support the members of the armed forces by using the last portion of service before discharge to support and repair the mental and physical health of our service men and women by passing laws to accomplish this goal; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Congress; President of the United States; support members of the armed forces and repair mental and physical health; urge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #719 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback