GA HR1107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the Department of Economic Development's Center for Aerospace Innovations and its Aerospace, Defense and Advance Manufacturing (ADAM) team along with the Department of Transportation and other relevant state agencies to collectively work to construct, enhance, focus, and recruit the emerging commercial space industry in Georgia; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development, Department of; construct the emerging commercial space industry in Georgia; urge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #801 (Y: 111 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-27HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-23HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-21HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-19HouseHouse Postponed
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback