GA HR1090 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION authorizing the change of use of certain property located in Jeff Davis County currently dedicated as a heritage preserve and authorizing the granting of a revocable license agreement and a nonexclusive easement for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities and ingress and egress in, on, over, under, upon, across, or through certain state owned real property located in Jeff Davis County; authorizing the change of use of certain property located in Crisp County currently dedicated as a heritage preserve and authorizing the granting of a revocable license agreement and a nonexclusive easement for the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities and ingress and egress in, on, over, under, upon, across, or through certain state owned real property; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jeff Davis County; Crisp County; change of use of certain property; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #578 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 541
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-15SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback