GA HR1076 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the federal government to provide port funding; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal government; provide port funding; urge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #521 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-20HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback