GA HR1053 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to create a reliable, predictable stream of resources to address deferred maintenance needs in America's National Park System; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Congress; create a reliable stream of resources to address deferred maintenance needs in America's National Park System; urge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #741 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback