GA HR1024 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Indexing Maximum Weekly Workers' Compensation Indemnity Benefits; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Indexing Maximum Weekly Workers' Compensation Indemnity Benefits; create
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Gregg Kennard [D] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] |
Rep. Samuel Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Recommit To Rules: House Vote #883 (Y: 97 N: 65 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62877 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/209571 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62877#19835 |