GA HR1008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the State Board of Pardons and Paroles to issue a posthumous pardon for Susan Eberhart; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Pardons and Paroles; issue posthumous pardon for Susan Eberhart; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57040 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/188936 |