GA HR1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION naming the forthcoming new state appellate judicial complex the "Nathan Deal Judicial Center"; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nathan Deal Judicial Center; naming the forthcoming new state appellate judicial complex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #48 (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #15 (Y: 159 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 304
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-02-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-02-22SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-14HouseHouse Hopper
2018-11-15HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback