GA HB999 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-129 of the O.C.G.A., relating to weapons carry license, temporary renewal permit, mandamus, and verification of license, so as to clarify the type of hospitalization as an inpatient in any mental hospital that prohibits the issuance of a weapons carry license; to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of the Georgia Crime Information Center; to amend Title 37 of the O.C.G.A., relating to mental health, so to require judicial notification to certain persons admitted to certain facilities of certain firearm prohibitions that attach to such admission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons; carry license; inpatient hospitalization; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #660 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback