GA HB999 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-129 of the O.C.G.A., relating to weapons carry license, temporary renewal permit, mandamus, and verification of license, so as to clarify the type of hospitalization as an inpatient in any mental hospital that prohibits the issuance of a weapons carry license; to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of the Georgia Crime Information Center; to amend Title 37 of the O.C.G.A., relating to mental health, so to require judicial notification to certain persons admitted to certain facilities of certain firearm prohibitions that attach to such admission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Weapons; carry license; inpatient hospitalization; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Clay Cox [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #660 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #660 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Hopper |