GA HB998 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to game and fish, so as to change the effective date of rules and regulations promulgated by the Board of Natural Resources; to revise the implied consent warning for hunting under the influence; to amend Code Section 52-7-12.5 of the O.C.G.A., relating to ordering drug, alcohol, or other substance tests and implied consent notice relative to operation of watercraft, so as to revise the implied consent warning; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to other state symbols, so as to designate the shoal bass as the official Georgia state riverine sport fish; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; effective date of rules and regulations promulgated by the Board of Natural Resources; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #755 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #714 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #715 (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #604 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Effective Date
2020-08-05 Act 600
2020-08-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-23SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-23SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-06-23SenateSenate Third Read Tabled
2020-06-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-16SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-25HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/998
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/190744.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/192010.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/193236.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194086.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194563.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/195237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17651
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17862
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17968

Bill Comments

feedback