GA HB996 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-34-242 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the "Georgia Cosmetic Laser Services Act," so as to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Cosmetic Laser Services Act; revise a definition
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57639 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190694 |