GA HB996 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 25 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Technology Authority, so as to establish the Strategic Integrated Data System; to create a governing board and provide for its membership and terms; to provide for oversight of the project; to provide for board responsibilities; to provide for reporting; to provide for funding; to provide for data sharing; to provide for immunity; to provide for open records and meetings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Technology Authority; Strategic Integrated Data System; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #639 (Y: 170 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Hopper |