GA HB992 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for a fourth judge of the superior courts of the Houston Judicial Circuit; to provide for the appointment of such additional judge by the Governor; to provide for the election of successors to the judge initially appointed; to prescribe the powers of such judge; to prescribe the compensation, salary, and expense allowance of such judge to be paid by the State of Georgia and the counties comprising said circuit; to authorize the judges of such circuit to divide and allocate the work and duties thereof; to provide for the manner of impaneling jurors; to provide for an additional court reporter for such circuit; to authorize the governing authorities of the counties comprising the Houston Judicial Circuit to provide facilities, office space, supplies, equipment, and personnel for such judges; to declare inherent authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Houston Judicial Circuit; provide for fourth judge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #772 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #431 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-22 Effective Date 2024-07-01
2024-04-22 Act 401
2024-04-22HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2024-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2024-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2024-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2024-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2024-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-02-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2024-02-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-01-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2024-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2024-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback