GA HB991 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to provide for transparency relating to state healthcare plans and its contractors; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for an oversight committee; to provide for its members and powers; to provide for information from state contractors and others to the oversight committee regarding state healthcare plans; to provide for confidentiality of certain records; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthcare Transparency and Accountability Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #735 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #668 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #576 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Veto V2
2020-08-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-20SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-15SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback