GA HB99 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 6 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to joint tenancy with survivorship, so as to provide for tenancy in common when joint tenants divorce or have their marriage annulled, under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; joint tenants divorce or have marriage annulled under certain circumstances; provide procedure for tenancy in common
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #395 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #398 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #90 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #398 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #90 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 109 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |