GA HB985 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the town of Hull, partly in Clarke County and partly in the county of Madison, Georgia, approved August 24, 1905 (Ga. L. 1905, p. 893), as amended, so as to revise the terms of office and timing of elections for the mayor and councilmembers; to provide for posts; to revise provisions related to the appointment of a mayor pro tem; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hull, Town of; revise terms of office and timing of elections for mayor and councilmembers
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #595 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 496 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Hopper |