GA HB983 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 1 of Title 42 of the O.C.G.A., relating to Sexual Offender Registration Review Board, so as to revise the information required to be provided by sexual offenders when they register; to allow a sexual offender who is in a state or privately operated hospice facility, skilled nursing home, or residential health care facility, with the approval of the sheriff of the county where such sexual offender resides, to satisfy the annual registration requirements by registering at any time during the sexual offender's month of birth; to remove the requirement that a sexual offender who resides in a state or privately operated hospice facility, skilled nursing home, or residential health care facility, with the approval of the sheriff of the county where such sexual offender resides, be fingerprinted; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Offender Registration Review Board; information required to be provided by sexual offenders when they register; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #750 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #652 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #543 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-08-03 Act 554
2020-08-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-18SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback