GA HB982 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the State Workforce Development Board, so as to require the State Workforce Development Board to develop, approve, and annually publish a High-demand Career List identifying those careers most critical to the state's current and future workforce needs; to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for conforming changes; to require the Office of Student Achievement to work in consultation with the State Workforce Development Board to audit and report on the effectiveness of employment, wage attainment, and retention of students in programs that align with the High-demand Career List; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Workforce Development Board; publish a High-demand Career List most critical to the state's current and future workforce needs; require
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Soo Hong [R] | Rep. Farooq Mughal [D] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #650 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #449 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #449 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |
2024-05-02 | Act 554 | |
2024-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |