GA HB974 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to recordation and registration of deeds and other instruments, so as to require electronic filing; to provide for the effect of a missing or incorrect tax parcel identification number on a recorded instrument; to amend Chapter 14 of Title 44, relating to mortgages, conveyances to secure debt, and liens, so as to require certain information on the first page of security deeds; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; deeds; require electronic filing
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Stan Gunter [R] | Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #900 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #857 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #586 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #857 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #586 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 754 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-14 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hopper |