GA HB973 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 1-4-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public and legal holidays and leave for observance of religious holidays not specifically provided for, so as to designate June 19 of each year as a state holiday; to provide for legislative findings; to revise the number of holidays that are observed in Georgia; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State holidays; June 19 of each year; designate
Sponsors
Rep. Miriam Paris [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |