GA HB973 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, so as to provide that lobbyists shall acknowledge receiving, reading, and agreeing to abide by the sexual harassment policy of the General Assembly as a condition to lobbyist registration; to provide that violation of the sexual harassment policy by a lobbyist shall be grounds for sanctioning such lobbyist; to provide that complaints regarding violation of the sexual harassment policy of the General Assembly by any lobbyist may be reported to the Georgia Government Transparency and Campaign Finance Commission by the General Assembly with recommendations for sanctions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics in government; lobbyists shall acknowledge and agree to abide by sexual harassment policy of General Assembly; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #810 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #717 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #594 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 493
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback