GA HB97 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 9 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to jurisdiction, power, and duties, so as to require and to provide for an oath for certain clerks of the probate court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; oath for certain clerks of the probate court; require and provide
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #417 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #32 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #32 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 170 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |