GA HB955 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes against the person, so as to repeal enhanced penalties relating to simple battery and battery against a person who is 65 years of age or older or by an employee, agent, or volunteer in a long-term care facility; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 30 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the protection of disabled adults and elder persons, so as to repeal a provision relating to criminal offenses and penalties for failure to report abuse or exploitation of a resident in a long-term care facility; to amend Code Section 31-7-351 of the O.C.G.A., relating to definitions relative to the Georgia long-term care background check program, so as to make a conforming change; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 16 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to death investigations by coroners; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; simple battery against a person 65 years of age or older; repeal enhanced penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] |
Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hopper |