GA HB954 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that the judge of the Probate Court of Emanuel County shall also serve as the chief magistrate judge of the Magistrate Court of Emanuel County on and after January 1, 2025; to provide for the continuation in office and expiration of term of the current chief magistrate judge; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Emanuel County; Probate Court judge also serves as chief magistrate judge of Magistrate Court; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #404 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #404 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-04-22 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 440 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |