GA HB952 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacies, so as to prohibit corporations that own and operate multiple pharmacies from implementing policies and procedures that restrict the quantity of controlled substances dispensed or restrict the prescriber; to provide for an exception; to prohibit retaliation; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pharmacies; prohibit corporations that own and operate multiple pharmacies from implementing policies and procedures that restrict the quantity of controlled substances dispensed or restrict the prescriber
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House Postponed |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57476 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190208 |