GA HB949 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 9 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to illegal use of financial transaction cards, and Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to revise a definition; to revise provisions of law relating to government purchasing cards and government credit cards; to provide for the issuance of government purchasing cards and government credit cards; to provide for the conditions for such issuance; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; illegal use of financial transaction cards; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #865 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #673 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #607 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #673 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #607 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 484 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House Hopper |