GA HB949 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
A BILL to amend an Act providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2009, and ending June 30, 2010, known as the "General Appropriations Act," approved May 11, 2009, as House Bill 119, Act. No. 345 (Ga. L. 2009, Vol. I, Book II).
Title
General Appropriations Act; State Fiscal Year 2009 - 2010; change certain appropriations
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cole [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-25 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/29125 |