GA HB946 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 64 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to regulation and licensure of pharmacy benefits managers, so as to provide extensive revisions regarding pharmacy benefits managers; to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to license requirements and filing fees; to revise a provision regarding the prohibition on the practice of medicine by a pharmacy benefits manager; to provide additional authority for the Insurance Commissioner to regulate pharmacy benefits managers; to revise provisions relating to rebates from pharmaceutical manufacturers; to revise provisions relating to administration of claims; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; extensive revisions regarding pharmacy benefits managers; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #734 (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #673 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Vote #524 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-08-05 Act 583
2020-08-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-22SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-06-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-22SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-04HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-04HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-20HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback