GA HB945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from certain Macon-Bibb County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of that homestead exceeds the base year assessed value of that homestead subject to an annual change of no more than 2 percent; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon-Bibb County; ad valorem tax; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #676 (Y: 104 N: 56 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-23 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52927 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/173783 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52927#15958 |