GA HB944 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to provide for the pronouncement of death of patients in nursing homes who are organ donors by a physician assistant or a registered professional nurse; to provide for the pronouncement of death of patients in hospice care who are organ donors by a registered professional nurse; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; pronouncement of death of patients in nursing homes who are organ donors by a physician assistant or registered professional nurse; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Gilligan [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #591 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #591 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hopper |