GA HB942 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Savannah State Farmers Market Authority; to define certain terms; to provide for a board of trustees, appointment of members, and meetings; to provide for powers, duties, and purpose; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority and to authorize the collection for the payment of such revenue bonds; to make the revenue bonds of the authority exempt from taxation; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for the validation of bonds; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Savannah State Farmers Market Authority Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #684 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V14
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-02-23HouseHouse Postponed
2018-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback