GA HB941 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to comprehensively revise elections and voting by repealing Act No. 9 (Senate Bill No. 202) approved on March 25, 2021 (Ga. L. 2021, p. 14); to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to revise certain definitions; to amend Chapter 35 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to home rule powers, so as to repeal the delay of reapportionment of municipal corporation election districts when census numbers are delayed; to amend Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding state government, so as to repeal certain limitations on the submission and suspension of emergency rules by the State Election Board; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; comprehensively revise by repealing 2021 Act No. 9; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Donna McLeod [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Dewey McClain [D] |
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Doreen Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61215 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/203603 |