GA HB940 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to allow the Department of Driver Services to mark and return surrendered licenses and personal identification cards; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Driver Services, Department of; mark and return surrendered licenses and personal identification cards; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Cauble [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #604 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52875 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/173574 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52875#15837 |