GA HB94 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the creation of the office of county administrator of Mitchell County, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 3616), so as to provide the county administrator with final authority to take employment action on department heads subject to consultation with the board of commissioners; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mitchell County; county administrator; provide final authority to take employment action on department heads subject to consultation with the board of commissioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #46 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #18 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 105
2023-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-02-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-02-06HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2023-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback