GA HB94 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to theft, so as to provide for the crime of theft by possession of stolen mail; to provide for the crime of porch piracy; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; provide for the crime of theft by possession of stolen mail; provide for the crime of porch piracy
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. Stan Gunter [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #366 (Y: 103 N: 59 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #348 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #150 (Y: 101 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #348 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #150 (Y: 101 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 269 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |