GA HB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to solid waste management, so as to provide for safe disposal of coal ash in municipal solid waste and commercial industrial solid waste landfills; to provide for definitions; to provide requirements for siting new or expanded landfills receiving coal combustion residuals; to provide for such landfills permitted prior to July 1, 2019; to provide for ground-water detection monitoring; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste management; safe disposal of coal ash in municipal solid waste and commercial industrial solid waste landfills; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback