GA HB935 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Recorder's Court of Gwinnett County, approved March 27, 1972 (Ga. L. 1972, p. 3125), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4297) and an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5149), so as to provide for senior judges of said court; to modify how the clerk of court is appointed; to change the compensation of the judge pro hac vice; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gwinnett County; Recorder's Court; provide for senior judges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #742 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #471 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Veto V1
2020-08-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-19HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback