GA HB934 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 5A of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the special district mass transportation sales and use tax, so as to provide for the maximum amount and time frame for the collection of such tax when an intergovernmental agreement has been entered into between a county and municipality; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; special district mass transportation; local government; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] |
Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #844 (Y: 146 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #657 (Y: 150 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #657 (Y: 150 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 752 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House Hopper |