GA HB93 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to control of water pollution and surface-water use, so as to provide notice to local governing authorities prior to the dewatering of coal combustion residual surface impoundments; to provide for minimum notice requirements to the public of such dewatering; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water pollution and surface-water use; notice to local governing authorities prior to the dewatering of coal combustion residual surface impoundments; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback