GA HB929 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections, so as to enact the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote; to allow states to join together to establish an interstate compact to elect the president by national popular vote; to provide for the implementation of such compact; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2016-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2016-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback