GA HB923 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use taxes, so as to provide an exemption for fire districts which have elected governing bodies and are supported by ad valorem taxes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; fire districts which have elected governing bodies and are supported by ad valorem taxes; provide exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #597 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Hopper |