GA HB922 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Douglas County Board of Education, approved April 13, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4786), as amended, so as to provide new district boundaries; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Douglas County; Board of Education; provide new district boundaries
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
Rep. Mandisha Thomas [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #457 (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #456 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #457 (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #456 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 321 | |
2022-02-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-26 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-01-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-14 | House | House Hopper |