GA HB918 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to revise the individual exemption amounts; to revise provisions relating to assignment of corporate income tax credits; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Internal Revenue Code; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #573 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #575 (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #673 (Y: 135 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Vote #540 (Y: 134 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #575 (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #673 (Y: 135 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Vote #540 (Y: 134 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Effective Date | |
2018-03-02 | Act 284 | |
2018-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-01 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-22 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |