GA HB914 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-161 of the O.C.G.A., relating to definitions relative to setoff debt collection, to provide for the definition of debt owed and collectable through setoff of income tax refunds to include civil monetary penalties for certain traffic law violations; to amend Article 8 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to school buses, so as to distinguish between violations of prohibition on overtaking a school bus as criminal and civil; to provide for notice of such violations when evidenced through a video recording device; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; provide definitions; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52740 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/173127 |