GA HB913 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 4 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Veterans Service, so as to require the maintenance of a women veterans' program by the commissioner of veterans service; to provide for the purposes of such women veterans' program; to require an annual report; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Service, Department of; women veterans' program; require maintenance
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. John Yates [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] |
Rep. Earnest Smith [D] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48102 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/156523 |