GA HB91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation and construction of hospitals and other health care facilities, so as to allow the Georgia Bureau of Investigation and, as authorized, the Federal Bureau of Investigation to retain fingerprints when an agency or entity is participating in the Georgia Bureau of Investigation's program; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals and health care facilities; Federal Bureau of Investigation to retain fingerprints when an agency or entity is participating in the Georgia Bureau of Investigation's program; allow

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #284 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #179 (Y: 168 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-01 Effective Date
2019-04-28 Act 74
2019-04-28HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback