GA HB91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners for the County of Grady, approved December 22, 1937 (Ga. L. 1937-38, Ex. Sess. p. 837), as amended, so as to change the compensation of the board; to remove the board's authority to fix the salary of the chairperson; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grady County; board of commissioners; change compensation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-01-30HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback