GA HB91 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-3-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the description of the state flag, defacing public monuments, and obstruction of Stone Mountain, so as to provide for additional protections for government statues, monuments, plaques, banners, and other commemorative symbols; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government statues and monuments; additional protections; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-03-28HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2013-02-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2013-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback